NJ A111 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1758
Note: Carry Foward to future A3141
Note: Carry Over of previous A219
Note: Carry Foward to future A3141
Note: Carry Over of previous A219
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes special Combat Action Badge license plate program.
Title
Authorizes special Combat Action Badge license plate program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Karabinchak) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A111 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A111 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A219 (Carry Over) 2017-03-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2445 (Same As) 2018-09-13 - Combined with S149 (SCS)
S149 (Same As) 2018-09-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A111 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A219 (Carry Over) 2017-03-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2445 (Same As) 2018-09-13 - Combined with S149 (SCS)
S149 (Same As) 2018-09-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee