NJ S1485 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2306
Note: Carry Foward to future A2369
Note: Carry Over of previous S1573
Note: Carry Over of previous A1534
Note: Carry Over of previous S252
Note: Carry Foward to future A2369
Note: Carry Over of previous S1573
Note: Carry Over of previous A1534
Note: Carry Over of previous S252
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Works Act"; Permits businesses to create pre-employment training programs in partnership with nonprofit organizations or educational institutions; provides tax credit to businesses that provide financial assistance to pre-employment training programs; makes appropriation.
Title
"New Jersey Works Act"; Permits businesses to create pre-employment training programs in partnership with nonprofit organizations or educational institutions; provides tax credit to businesses that provide financial assistance to pre-employment training programs; makes appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1485 (Carry Over) 2023-05-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1485 (Carry Over) 2023-05-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A583 (Same As) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1573 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1534 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S252 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1485 (Carry Over) 2023-05-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A583 (Same As) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1573 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1534 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S252 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee