NJ S1477 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-22 - Substituted by A625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-22 - Substituted by A625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain unsolicited checks.
Title
Prohibits certain unsolicited checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-22 | Senate | Substituted by A625 |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A625 (Same As) 2015-10-26 - Approved P.L.2015, c.120.