NJ S1458 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5774

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands EDA small business loan program to include certain broadband telecommunications service providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands EDA small business loan program to include certain broadband telecommunications service providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
2020-07-30SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2020-06-25SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A185 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A5774 (Carry Over) 2019-08-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback