NJ S1431 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1538
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.210.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.210.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Pediatric Cancer Research Fund" and establishes requirements for disbursement of monies deposited in fund; provides for voluntary contributions by taxpayers on gross income tax returns for pediatric cancer research.
Title
Establishes "Pediatric Cancer Research Fund" and establishes requirements for disbursement of monies deposited in fund; provides for voluntary contributions by taxpayers on gross income tax returns for pediatric cancer research.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3800 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3800 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.210. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A3800 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1538 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3800 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S1431 (1R)
A3800 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S1431 (1R)