NJ S1413 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3316
Note: Carry Over of previous S2040
Note: Carry Over of previous A2390
Note: Carry Over of previous S2542
Note: Carry Over of previous S2040
Note: Carry Over of previous A2390
Note: Carry Over of previous S2542
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Reader Privacy Act."
Title
Enacts the "Reader Privacy Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1413 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2040 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2390 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A3262 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2542 (Carry Over) 2020-06-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2040 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2390 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A3262 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2542 (Carry Over) 2020-06-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1413 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1500/1413_I1.HTM |