NJ S2040 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1413
Note: Carry Foward to future A3262
Note: Carry Over of previous S1175
Note: Carry Over of previous A2163
Note: Carry Foward to future A3262
Note: Carry Over of previous S1175
Note: Carry Over of previous A2163
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Reader Privacy Act."
Title
Enacts the "Reader Privacy Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2040 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2040 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2390 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1175 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2163 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle)
S2040 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2390 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1175 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2163 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2040 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2040_I1.HTM |