NJ S1305 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2191

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A2993 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Medicaid coverage for diabetes self-management education, training, services, and equipment for patients diagnosed with diabetes, gestational diabetes, and pre-diabetes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Medicaid coverage for diabetes self-management education, training, services, and equipment for patients diagnosed with diabetes, gestational diabetes, and pre-diabetes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22SenateSubstituted by A2993 (2R)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-01-30SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2191 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A3460 (2R)
A2993 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.161.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback