NJ S1301 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2318
Note: Carry Over of previous S2877
Note: Carry Over of previous A4615
Note: Carry Over of previous S777
Note: Carry Over of previous A1519
Note: Carry Over of previous S2877
Note: Carry Over of previous A4615
Note: Carry Over of previous S777
Note: Carry Over of previous A1519
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises and updates law pertaining to conservatorship to encourage ethical conduct by conservators and to provide stronger protections for conservatees and proposed conservatees.
Title
Revises and updates law pertaining to conservatorship to encourage ethical conduct by conservators and to provide stronger protections for conservatees and proposed conservatees.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1301 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2877 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4615 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S777 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A1519 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S2877 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4615 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S777 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A1519 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1301 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1500/1301_I1.HTM |