NJ S1229 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Approved P.L.2018, c.14.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Approved P.L.2018, c.14.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increases annual salary of Governor's cabinet officers, judges, county prosecutors, and certain other public employees.*
Title
Increases annual salary of Governor's cabinet officers, judges, county prosecutors, and certain other public employees.*
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] |
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3685 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 23 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 23 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.14. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-23-1) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted for A3685 (1R) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-14) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Sweeney) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3685 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S1229 (2R)