NJ S1210 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4210
Note: Carry Over of previous A5496
Note: Carry Over of previous A5496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires pharmacy benefits manager under contract with SHBP and SEHBP to report price paid to pharmacy and amount charged to SHBP and SEHBP.
Title
Requires pharmacy benefits manager under contract with SHBP and SEHBP to report price paid to pharmacy and amount charged to SHBP and SEHBP.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1258 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S4210 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A5496 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S4210 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A5496 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1210 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1210_I1.HTM |