NJ S121 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3581

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.39.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Bars provisions in employment contracts that waive rights or remedies; bars agreements that conceal details relating to discrimination claims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bars provisions in employment contracts that waive rights or remedies; bars agreements that conceal details relating to discrimination claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1242 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.39.
2019-01-31SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
2019-01-31SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (68-3-5)
2019-01-31AssemblyMotion To Table (Greenwald) (50-23-0)
2019-01-31AssemblyMotion To Aa (DePhillips)
2019-01-31AssemblySubstituted for A1242 (2R)
2019-01-28AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-28AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-06-11AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-07SenatePassed by the Senate (34-1)
2018-03-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3581 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A1242 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S121 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback