NJ S1200 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S700
Note: Carry Over of previous A2401
Note: Carry Over of previous A2401
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a gross income tax deduction for certain higher education tuition and fee expenses.
Title
Allows a gross income tax deduction for certain higher education tuition and fee expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S700 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A2401 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A3434 (Same As) 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A2401 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A3434 (Same As) 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee