NJ S1163 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2266

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes certain requirements for use of restraint and seclusion on students with disabilities in school districts, educational services commissions, and approved private schools for students with disabilities.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes certain requirements for use of restraint and seclusion on students with disabilities in school districts, educational services commissions, and approved private schools for students with disabilities.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A501 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2018-01-08SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-01-08AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (68-0-0)
2018-01-08AssemblySubstituted for A501 (1R)
2017-12-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-12-14AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
2016-06-23AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
2016-06-23SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2016-05-23SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2266 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A501 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S1163 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback