NJ S1146 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S377
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.392.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.392.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospital patient's medical record to include notation if patient is at increased risk of confusion, agitation, behavioral problems, and wandering due to dementia related disorder.
Title
Requires hospital patient's medical record to include notation if patient is at increased risk of confusion, agitation, behavioral problems, and wandering due to dementia related disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2365 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.392. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A2365 (1R) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S377 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
A2365 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1146 (1R)
A2365 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1146 (1R)