NJ S1135 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1772

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits pharmacists to dispense certain drugs in emergency without prescription.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits pharmacists to dispense certain drugs in emergency without prescription.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-10-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1772 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3027 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback