NJ S1124 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits imposition of corporation business tax on certain foreign corporations carrying passengers into and out of State in motor vehicle or motorbus.
Title
Prohibits imposition of corporation business tax on certain foreign corporations carrying passengers into and out of State in motor vehicle or motorbus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-22 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Tourism and the Arts Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Passed by the Senate (40-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-15 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-11-15 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-08 | Transferred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A860 (Same As) 2010-01-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee