NJ S1041 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-4)
Status: Vetoed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits treatment, discharge, disposal, application to roadway, or storage of wastewater, wastewater solids, sludge, drill cuttings or other byproducts from natural gas exploration or production using hydraulic fracturing.*
Title
Prohibits treatment, discharge, disposal, application to roadway, or storage of wastewater, wastewater solids, sludge, drill cuttings or other byproducts from natural gas exploration or production using hydraulic fracturing.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2108 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2108 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2108 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-16-1) |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Substituted for A2108 (1R) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-5) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2108 (Same As) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by S1041 (1R)