NJ A2108 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Substituted by S1041 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits treatment, discharge, disposal, application to roadway, or storage of wastewater, wastewater solids, sludge, drill cuttings or other byproducts from natural gas exploration or production using hydraulic fracturing.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits treatment, discharge, disposal, application to roadway, or storage of wastewater, wastewater solids, sludge, drill cuttings or other byproducts from natural gas exploration or production using hydraulic fracturing.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-26AssemblySubstituted by S1041 (1R)
2014-06-23AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-01-16AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1041 (Same As) 2014-08-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback