NJ S1018 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1513
Note: Carry Foward to future S1657
Note: Carry Over of previous S3504
Note: Carry Over of previous A4238
Note: Carry Foward to future S1657
Note: Carry Over of previous S3504
Note: Carry Over of previous A4238
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes task force to examine school discipline practices including racial disparities and effectiveness.
Title
Establishes task force to examine school discipline practices including racial disparities and effectiveness.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (30-0) (Ruiz) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Ruiz) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment (22-0) (Gopal) |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1018 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1018 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2483 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3504 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4238 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1018 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2483 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3504 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4238 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading