NJ S1003 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1291

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A1576 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain health care facilities to provide, and employees to receive, annual influenza vaccination.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain health care facilities to provide, and employees to receive, annual influenza vaccination.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-16SenateSubstituted by A1576 (2R)
2019-12-12SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1291 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1576 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.330.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback