NJ A1576 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1810
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.330.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.330.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain health care facilities to provide, and employees to receive, annual influenza vaccination.**
Title
Requires certain health care facilities to provide, and employees to receive, annual influenza vaccination.**
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Amy Handlin [R] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1003 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1003 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.330. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-9-6) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-5) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted for S1003 (1R) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-1) (Vitale) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (62-9-6) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1810 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S1003 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A1576 (2R)
S1003 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A1576 (2R)