NJ AR58 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AR110
Note: Carry Over of previous AR201
Note: Carry Over of previous SR79
Note: Carry Over of previous AR201
Note: Carry Over of previous SR79
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to propose amendment to United States Constitution to prohibit use of slavery or indentured servitude for individuals convicted of crime.
Title
Urges Congress to propose amendment to United States Constitution to prohibit use of slavery or indentured servitude for individuals convicted of crime.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR58 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
AR201 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
SR16 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Filed with Secretary of State
SR79 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
AR201 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
SR16 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Filed with Secretary of State
SR79 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AR58 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AR/58_I1.HTM |