NJ AR147 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to increase access to skilled nursing facility and home office data.
Title
Urges Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to increase access to skilled nursing facility and home office data.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] |
Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (77-0-1) |
2023-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR97 (Same As) 2022-08-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee