NJ AJR83 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by SJR60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by SJR60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates October of each year as "Linemen Appreciation Month."
Title
Designates October of each year as "Linemen Appreciation Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR60 |
2014-12-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR60 (Same As) 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, JR-6.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/AJR83 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/AJR/83_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR83 |