NJ AJR76 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates fourth week of March of each year as "Military Caregivers Week."
Title
Designates fourth week of March of each year as "Military Caregivers Week."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR75 (Same As) 2015-11-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/AJR76 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/AJR/76_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR76 |