NJ AJR68 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR133
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR89
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR89
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Womens Affairs Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Womens Affairs Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May 17 of each year as "Menstrual Empowerment Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates May 17 of each year as "Menstrual Empowerment Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Shama Haider [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR133 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
SJR89 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR108 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR89 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR108 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/AJR68 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/AJR/68_I1.HTM |