NJ AJR59 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Approved P.L.2014, JR-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Approved P.L.2014, JR-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates March 30 of each year as "Doctor's Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates March 30 of each year as "Doctor's Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr44 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Substitute For Sjr44 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Substitute For Sjr44 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, JR-1. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Substituted for SJR44 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR44 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - Substituted by AJR59