NJ AJR37 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR121
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates June 21 of each year as "ASK Day" to promote children's health and gun safety.
Title
Designates June 21 of each year as "ASK Day" to promote children's health and gun safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr67 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 7 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 7 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, JR-13. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-0) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for SJR67 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (59-7-11) |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR121 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
SJR67 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by AJR37
SJR67 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by AJR37