NJ AJR23 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR109
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, JR-8.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, JR-8.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates third weekend in October each year as "Shuck, Sip, and Slurp Weekend" to promote NJ oysters, wine, and beer.
Title
Designates third weekend in October each year as "Shuck, Sip, and Slurp Weekend" to promote NJ oysters, wine, and beer.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. R. Bruce Land [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] |
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr30 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-05 | Senate | Approved P.L.2016, JR-8. |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Substituted for SJR30 |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-1-0) |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR109 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
SJR30 (Same As) 2016-10-20 - Substituted by AJR23
SJR30 (Same As) 2016-10-20 - Substituted by AJR23