NJ AJR21 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR101
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - Approved P.L.2016, JR-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - Approved P.L.2016, JR-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates first week of March as "Consumer Protection Week" in NJ.
Title
Designates first week of March as "Consumer Protection Week" in NJ.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr51 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2016, JR-1. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Substituted for SJR51 |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR101 (Carry Over) 2015-03-16 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
SJR51 (Same As) 2016-05-26 - Substituted by AJR21
SJR51 (Same As) 2016-05-26 - Substituted by AJR21