NJ AJR174 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-7.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Urges large food retailers in State to reduce food waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges large food retailers in State to reduce food waste.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR107 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, JR-7.
2019-02-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2019-02-21SenateSubstituted for SJR107 (1R)
2019-01-31SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-17SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2018-12-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

SJR107 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Substituted by AJR174 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback