NJ AJR17 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR91
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR41
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR41
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May of each year as "Skin Cancer Detection and Prevention Month" and first Monday in May as "Melanoma Monday."
Title
Designates May of each year as "Skin Cancer Detection and Prevention Month" and first Monday in May as "Melanoma Monday."
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR17 (Carry Over) 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR41 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
AJR41 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR17 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/17_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR17 |