NJ AJR137 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-18.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Urges United States President Trump, members of his administration, and Congress to oppose measures and actions to prohibit states from authorizing and conducting Internet gaming.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges United States President Trump, members of his administration, and Congress to oppose measures and actions to prohibit states from authorizing and conducting Internet gaming.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr102 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21SenateApproved P.L.2017, JR-18.
2017-06-22SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1)
2017-06-22SenateSubstituted for SJR102
2017-06-12SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-06-08AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-1)
2017-01-30AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-01-23AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee

Same As/Similar To

SJR102 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by AJR137

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback