NJ AJR13 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR169
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR125
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR125
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the second week of October of each year as "Obesity Care Week" in NJ.
Title
Designates the second week of October of each year as "Obesity Care Week" in NJ.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR169 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by SJR125 (1R)
SJR125 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-29.
SJR125 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-29.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AJR13 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AJR/13_I1.HTM |