NJ AJR126 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Commemorates establishment and service of the New Jersey State Police and celebrates 95th anniversary of first graduating class.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorates establishment and service of the New Jersey State Police and celebrates 95th anniversary of first graduating class.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr85 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21SenateApproved P.L.2017, JR-17.
2017-06-22SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2017-06-22SenateSubstituted for SJR85 (1R)
2017-06-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
2017-05-22AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2016-12-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-10-06AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

SJR85 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by AJR126 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback