NJ AJR112 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR41
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates calendar week that includes September 10th of each year as "Suicide Prevention Week" in NJ.
Title
Designates calendar week that includes September 10th of each year as "Suicide Prevention Week" in NJ.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2024-09-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR41 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
SJR118 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR118 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee