NJ AJR109 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR12
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR30
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR30
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates November of each year as "Diversity Month in New Jersey."
Title
Designates November of each year as "Diversity Month in New Jersey."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-2-0) |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR109 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
AJR109 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
SJR91 (Same As) 2016-11-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
AJR109 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
SJR91 (Same As) 2016-11-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee