NJ ACR173 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-5)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges United States government to take additional action to prevent Iran from obtaining a nuclear weapon.
Title
Urges United States government to take additional action to prevent Iran from obtaining a nuclear weapon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) | |
2011-12-15 | Substituted for SCR245 | |
2011-08-25 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-12 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee | |
2011-05-09 | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SCR158 (Same As) 2011-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/ACR173 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/ACR/173_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR173 |