NJ ACR119 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by SCR78 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by SCR78 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorates women's access to reproductive health care and annual anniversary of Supreme Court ruling in Roe v. Wade. *
Title
Commemorates women's access to reproductive health care and annual anniversary of Supreme Court ruling in Roe v. Wade. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted by SCR78 (2R) |
2016-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-12 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR78 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Filed with Secretary of State