NJ A2023 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-19 - Approved P.L.2012, c.52.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits slaughter of horses and sale of horse flesh for human consumption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits slaughter of horses and sale of horse flesh for human consumption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1976 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-19AssemblyApproved P.L.2012, c.52.
2012-06-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-3-1)
2012-06-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2012-06-25SenatePassed by the Senate (35-4)
2012-06-25SenateSubstituted for S1976 (1R)
2012-06-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-05-31SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2012-05-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-3-0)
2012-05-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-01-10AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1976 (Same As) 2012-06-25 - Substituted by A2023 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback