NJ S1976 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-25 - Substituted by A2023 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-25 - Substituted by A2023 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits slaughter of horses and sale of horse flesh for human consumption.
Title
Prohibits slaughter of horses and sale of horse flesh for human consumption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A2023 (2R) |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2023 (Same As) 2012-09-19 - Approved P.L.2012, c.52.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S1976 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2000/1976_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2000/1976_R1.HTM |