NJ A986 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A837
Note: Carry Foward to future S2610
Note: Carry Over of previous A3889
Note: Carry Over of previous S3556
Note: Carry Foward to future S2610
Note: Carry Over of previous A3889
Note: Carry Over of previous S3556
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires landlord to attach certificate of inspection or occupancy to residential lease.
Title
Requires landlord to attach certificate of inspection or occupancy to residential lease.
Sponsors
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A986 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A986 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3889 (Carry Over) 2020-03-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S3556 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2059 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A986 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3889 (Carry Over) 2020-03-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S3556 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2059 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A986 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1000/986_I1.HTM |