NJ A910 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1704
Note: Carry Over of previous A2648
Note: Carry Over of previous A2648
Note: Carry Over of previous A2648
Note: Carry Over of previous A2648
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain gestational carrier agreements.
Title
Authorizes certain gestational carrier agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A910 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A2648 (Carry Over) 2015-05-14 - Substituted by S866
S1238 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A2648 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A2648 (Carry Over) 2015-05-14 - Substituted by S866
S1238 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A2648 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A910 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A1000/910_I1.HTM |