NJ A1704 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A910
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S482 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S482 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain gestational carrier agreements.
Title
Authorizes certain gestational carrier agreements.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted by S482 (2R) |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A910 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S482 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.18.
S482 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.18.