NJ A909 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on November 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-30 - Approved P.L.2010, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on November 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-30 - Approved P.L.2010, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes companies under BPU jurisdiction to bill customers electronically upon customers' request.
Title
Authorizes companies under BPU jurisdiction to bill customers electronically upon customers' request.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | Approved P.L.2010, c.90. | |
2010-10-18 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) | |
2010-10-18 | Substituted for S583 | |
2010-10-14 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee | |
2010-02-25 | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) | |
2010-02-25 | Motion To Table (Cryan) (47-29-0) | |
2010-02-25 | Motion To AA (Thompson) | |
2010-02-08 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S583 (Same As) 2010-10-18 - Substituted by A909