NJ A876 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1854
Note: Carry Foward to future S2581
Note: Carry Over of previous A923
Note: Carry Foward to future S2581
Note: Carry Over of previous A923
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Secretary of Higher Education to study prevalence, cost, and quality of certain on-line courses compared to traditional classroom courses offered by institutions of higher education.
Title
Directs Secretary of Higher Education to study prevalence, cost, and quality of certain on-line courses compared to traditional classroom courses offered by institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A876 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A876 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A923 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S3170 (Same As) 2020-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A876 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A923 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S3170 (Same As) 2020-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A876 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1000/876_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A876 |