NJ A854 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - Substituted by S255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - Substituted by S255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits towing and transportation of boats during emergency evacuations.
Title
Prohibits towing and transportation of boats during emergency evacuations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Substituted by S255 | |
2011-06-13 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S255 (Same As) 2011-08-18 - Approved P.L.2011, c.103.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A854 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A1000/854_I1.HTM |