NJ A825 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading w/o recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading w/o recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for drunk driving with a minor as a passenger.
Title
Increases penalties for drunk driving with a minor as a passenger.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Mainor [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] |
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported without Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading w/o recommendation |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-1-1) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2093 (Same As) 2015-06-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading w/o recommedation
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/A825 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/A1000/825_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A825 |