NJ A823 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on February 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-21 - Approved P.L.2011, c.23.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on February 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-21 - Approved P.L.2011, c.23.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DEP to establish free recreational saltwater fishing registry.
Title
Requires DEP to establish free recreational saltwater fishing registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | Approved P.L.2011, c.23. | |
2011-01-06 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-7-3) | |
2011-01-06 | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2010-12-20 | Passed by the Senate (36-0) | |
2010-12-20 | Substituted for S1122 (1R) | |
2010-12-20 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-09 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-12-09 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-22 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Passed by the Assembly (54-16-6) | |
2010-03-15 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Albano) | |
2010-03-08 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1122 (Same As) 2010-12-20 - Substituted by A823 (2R)